NY S05939 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Center for Rapid Recovery Inc. in the town of Hempstead to submit an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Center for Rapid Recovery Inc. in the town of Hempstead to submit an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.260
2017-08-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.575
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8374
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2017-06-19AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenateREPASSED SENATE
2017-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5939A
2017-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2017-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2017-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2017-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1116
2017-05-08SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07710 (Same As) 2017-05-10 - referred to real property taxation
A08374 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5939a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05939&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05939&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05939
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05939&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05939A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5939#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5939#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5939#SF2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05939&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback