NY S05935 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - VETOED MEMO.292
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to medication assisted treatment for substance abuse disorders; prohibits prior authorization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to medication assisted treatment for substance abuse disorders; prohibits prior authorization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-01AssemblyVETOED MEMO.292
2019-12-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.456
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a7246b
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-17AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5935A
2019-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1170
2019-06-04SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A07246 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s5935a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05935&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05935&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05935
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05935&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05935A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5935#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5935#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5935#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05935&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback