NY S05925 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a blue alert system to aid in the identification, location and apprehension of any individuals suspected of killing or seriously wounding any local, state or federal law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a blue alert system to aid in the identification, location and apprehension of any individuals suspected of killing or seriously wounding any local, state or federal law enforcement officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1574
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A04579 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - print number 4579b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback