NY S05924 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5924C
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5924C
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that service retirement benefits for members of the NYC police pension fund shall not be reduced by the primary social security retirement benefit commencing at age sixty-two.
Title
Provides that service retirement benefits for members of the NYC police pension fund shall not be reduced by the primary social security retirement benefit commencing at age sixty-two.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5924C |
2020-03-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5924B |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5924A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08182 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - print number 8182a