NY S05921 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York deforestation-free procurement act requiring that companies contracting with the state do not contribute to tropical or boreal intact forest degradation or deforestation directly or through their supply chains.
Title
Enacts the New York deforestation-free procurement act requiring that companies contracting with the state do not contribute to tropical or boreal intact forest degradation or deforestation directly or through their supply chains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Procurement And Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Procurement And Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1215 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5921A |
2022-03-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.688 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A06872 (Same As) 2022-03-25 - print number 6872a