NY S05913 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to including the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton, trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of East Hampton and the trustees of Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of section 72-h of the general municipal law.
Title
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to including the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton, trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of East Hampton and the trustees of Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of section 72-h of the general municipal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.86 |
2015-07-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.510 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a8183 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1748 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08183 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5913