NY S05912 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the annual service charge for distinctive plates for members of volunteer ambulance services and replaces it with a one time service charge of twenty dollars.
Title
Eliminates the annual service charge for distinctive plates for members of volunteer ambulance services and replaces it with a one time service charge of twenty dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.355 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04198 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation