NY S05903 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.431
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city police pension fund to receive a membership date in such pension fund attributable to service in the titles of police cadet program or police cadet program II.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city police pension fund to receive a membership date in such pension fund attributable to service in the titles of police cadet program or police cadet program II.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.431
2019-10-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.653
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7620a
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1699
2019-06-19SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 5903A
2019-06-16SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07620 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5903a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback