NY S05898 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.252
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing a final average salary disability retirement benefit to certain participants in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing a final average salary disability retirement benefit to certain participants in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblySIGNED CHAP.252
2019-09-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.631
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8278c
2019-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1805
2019-06-19SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 5898D
2019-06-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 5898C
2019-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-06-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 5898B
2019-06-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-06-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 5898A
2019-06-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A08278 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5898d

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898D
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5898#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5898#SC1

Bill Comments

feedback