NY S05890 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sick leave for officers and employees with a qualifying World Trade Center condition.
Title
Relates to sick leave for officers and employees with a qualifying World Trade Center condition.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.5 |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.251 |
2019-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.693 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7819a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1351 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5890A |
2019-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07819 (Same As) 2019-09-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.5