NY S05886 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts the Buchanan Engine Company No. 1, within the village of Buchanan, county of Westchester from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts the Buchanan Engine Company No. 1, within the village of Buchanan, county of Westchester from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A6101
2023-05-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1107
2023-05-22SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-03-21SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06101 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - signed chap.398

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback