NY S05884 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds certain fentanyl derivatives to the schedule of controlled substances regulated by the department of health.
Title
Adds certain fentanyl derivatives to the schedule of controlled substances regulated by the department of health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.873 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5884A |
2018-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1153 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |