NY S05865 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.371
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.371
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of New Hartford, county of Oneida to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland.
Title
Authorizes the town of New Hartford, county of Oneida to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.371 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.695 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7851a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5865A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.945 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07851 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.371