NY S05863 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.186
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs a study on the feasibility of adjusting the compulsory attendance age of minors attending full time instruction; on or before July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs a study on the feasibility of adjusting the compulsory attendance age of minors attending full time instruction; on or before July 1, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-06AssemblyVETOED MEMO.186
2019-11-26SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.602
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7559a
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1572
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 5863A
2019-05-30SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07559 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5863a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback