NY S05855 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of the department of transportation, to conduct a study on the environmental and human health impacts of John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of the department of transportation, to conduct a study on the environmental and human health impacts of John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.628
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7710
2019-06-06Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2019-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1221
2019-06-06SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A07710 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5855

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback