NY S05848 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 5848C
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 5848C
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a dental hygienist shall not administer anesthesia without a certificate and except under the personal supervision of a dentist authorized by law and in accordance with regulations promulgated by the commissioner.
Title
Provides that a dental hygienist shall not administer anesthesia without a certificate and except under the personal supervision of a dentist authorized by law and in accordance with regulations promulgated by the commissioner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5848C |
2020-01-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED 5848B |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 5848A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1042 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00462 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education