NY S05845 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the annual service fee for distinctive "September eleventh, two thousand one remembrance" license plates for certain first responders.
Title
Waives the annual service fee for distinctive "September eleventh, two thousand one remembrance" license plates for certain first responders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.568 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |