NY S05842 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to guardianship and health care decisions of persons with developmental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to guardianship and health care decisions of persons with developmental disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2017-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2215
2017-06-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-02SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05840 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback