NY S05838 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5838B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5838B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to application of the state uniform fire prevention and building code and relevant local building and fire regulations; directs OGS to implement a phase-in of compliance.
Title
Relates to application of the state uniform fire prevention and building code and relevant local building and fire regulations; directs OGS to implement a phase-in of compliance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5838B |
2020-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5838A |
2020-02-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |