NY S05837 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "food service waste reduction act"; provides for a prohibition on the use of certain disposable food service ware; provides definitions and sanctions.
Title
Enacts the "food service waste reduction act"; provides for a prohibition on the use of certain disposable food service ware; provides definitions and sanctions.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08611 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
A10578 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to environmental conservation
A10578 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to environmental conservation