NY S05832 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the mandatory retirement age of New York state regional park police from 62 to 65 years old.
Title
Relates to increasing the mandatory retirement age of New York state regional park police from 62 to 65 years old.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2024-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5832A |
2024-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05715 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees