NY S05825 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of mental health to review all proposals by an agency to provide new services at a new facility, expand the size of existing facilities or change the type of services that are provided at facilities within a city of one million or more; provides a definition for the types of facilities subject to such review; directs the commissioner of mental health to issue a report regarding such review.
Title
Directs the commissioner of mental health to review all proposals by an agency to provide new services at a new facility, expand the size of existing facilities or change the type of services that are provided at facilities within a city of one million or more; provides a definition for the types of facilities subject to such review; directs the commissioner of mental health to issue a report regarding such review.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.531 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1173 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH |