NY S05818 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5057B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the dates to file a designating petition; provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the dates to file a designating petition; provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A5057B
2023-03-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.571
2023-03-28SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-03-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 5818A
2023-03-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2023-03-17SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05057 (Same As) 2023-03-31 - signed chap.120

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback