NY S05815 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7540B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to regulatory penalties for small businesses; provides that upon an initial violation of a state agency's rules or regulations, a small business shall be afforded a cure period or other opportunity for ameliorative action, which if successful shall prevent the imposition of a fine or fines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to regulatory penalties for small businesses; provides that upon an initial violation of a state agency's rules or regulations, a small business shall be afforded a cure period or other opportunity for ameliorative action, which if successful shall prevent the imposition of a fine or fines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A7540B
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5815C
2019-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13Assemblyreferred to small business
2019-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1349
2019-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 5815B
2019-06-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-06-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 5815A
2019-06-03SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A07540 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05815
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05815A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05815B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05815C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5815#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5815#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5815#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback