NY S05813 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.319
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.319
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Saratoga to transfer and convey reforested lands on Kinns Road to the town of Clifton Park, county of Saratoga for use by the town of Clifton Park for continued park and recreational purposes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Saratoga to transfer and convey reforested lands on Kinns Road to the town of Clifton Park, county of Saratoga for use by the town of Clifton Park for continued park and recreational purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.319 |
2017-09-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.502 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7510b |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1730 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5813B |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5813A |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07510 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5813b