NY S05807 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to sentencing for the crime of aggravated cruelty to animals; removes the two year imprisonment cap.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to sentencing for the crime of aggravated cruelty to animals; removes the two year imprisonment cap.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.188
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2019-06-12AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5807A
2019-06-06SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-05Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-05AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-06-04Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2019-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1017
2019-05-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE

Same As/Similar To

A08157 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback