NY S05797 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5797C
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5797C
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that certain boats shall be equipped with functioning marine carbon monoxide detectors.
Title
Requires that certain boats shall be equipped with functioning marine carbon monoxide detectors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5797C |
2018-06-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2018-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5797B |
2018-01-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2017-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5797A |
2017-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2017-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |