NY S05795 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8408
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8408
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period of time for which a notice of proposed rule making must appear in the state register from 45 days to 60 days.
Title
Extends the period of time for which a notice of proposed rule making must appear in the state register from 45 days to 60 days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8408 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5795A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.977 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A08408 (Same As) 2017-12-13 - signed chap.455