NY S05794 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.133
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.133
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Liverpool central school district to receive state aid for certain approved capital funded projects.
Title
Authorizes the Liverpool central school district to receive state aid for certain approved capital funded projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.133 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.156 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a6773a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1198 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5794A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06773 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.133