NY S05786 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to explore the effects of cyber-bullying in New York state and potential measures to address such effects.
Title
Establishes a task force to explore the effects of cyber-bullying in New York state and potential measures to address such effects.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5786B |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.161 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5786A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.970 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03057 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES