NY S05772 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires legislative approval for the closure of certain office of mental health, office for people with developmental disabilities or office of children and family services facilities and institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires legislative approval for the closure of certain office of mental health, office for people with developmental disabilities or office of children and family services facilities and institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30Assemblyreferred to mental health
2019-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.879
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES

Same As/Similar To

S00329 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
A07961 (Same As) 2019-05-29 - referred to mental health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback