NY S05769 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payments in lieu of taxes paid to the Minisink Valley central school district by Competitive Power Ventures.
Title
Relates to payments in lieu of taxes paid to the Minisink Valley central school district by Competitive Power Ventures.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1058 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07957 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation