NY S05768 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to prevailing wage and extending certain exemptions for new multiple dwellings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to prevailing wage and extending certain exemptions for new multiple dwellings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-05SenateRECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
2016-04-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 5768A
2016-04-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2015-06-02SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback