NY S05763 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to bureaus of administrative adjudication.
Title
Relates to bureaus of administrative adjudication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.146 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.392 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6917 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.803 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06917 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5763