NY S05759 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6709B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6709B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain income and resources provided to persons enrolled in certain pilot programs with direct cash transfers in determining eligibility for public assistance benefits.
Title
Exempts certain income and resources provided to persons enrolled in certain pilot programs with direct cash transfers in determining eligibility for public assistance benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6709B |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.836 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5759B |
2021-06-07 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5759A |
2021-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.807 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A06709 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - approval memo.63