NY S05757 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.190
Status: Introduced on June 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.190
Summary
Extends the authorization for East Hampton, Suffolk county, to issue certain serial bonds.
Title
Extends the authorization for East Hampton, Suffolk county, to issue certain serial bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8682 | |
2009-06-30 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.690 | |
2009-06-30 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-03 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08682 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.190
S50036 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S60438 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65058 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50036 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S60438 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65058 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05757&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |