NY S05754 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the calculation of weekly unemployment insurance and the repeal of certain provisions relating thereto.
Title
Relates to the calculation of weekly unemployment insurance and the repeal of certain provisions relating thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A00446 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - REFERRED TO LABOR