NY S05754 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the metropolitan transportation authority and New York city transit authority to study and report on the aboveground transit infrastructure of the metropolitan transit authority.
Title
Directs the metropolitan transportation authority and New York city transit authority to study and report on the aboveground transit infrastructure of the metropolitan transit authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.58 |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.492 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.503 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7562a |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5754A |
2017-06-13 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.976 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07562 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5754a