NY S05754 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.351
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.351
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Mattituck park district, town of Southold, county of Suffolk, to discontinue use of certain lands as parklands adjoining Love Lane and sell such lands.
Title
Authorizes the Mattituck park district, town of Southold, county of Suffolk, to discontinue use of certain lands as parklands adjoining Love Lane and sell such lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.351 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.683 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7946b |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1510 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5754B |
2015-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5754A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07946 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5754b