NY S05752 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5752D
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5752D
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boating safety certificates of all persons operating a mechanically propelled vessel; provides exception in the case of new owners and certain renters; provides for a phase in period and penalties for violations.
Title
Requires boating safety certificates of all persons operating a mechanically propelled vessel; provides exception in the case of new owners and certain renters; provides for a phase in period and penalties for violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | PRINT NUMBER 5752D | |
2010-06-24 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-03-05 | PRINT NUMBER 5752C | |
2010-03-05 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-06-18 | PRINT NUMBER 5752B | |
2009-06-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-06-05 | PRINT NUMBER 5752A | |
2009-06-05 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-06-03 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A5889-D (Same As) 2010-06-24 - amended on third reading 5889e