NY S05743 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6320A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6320A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants Danielle Galasso a retroactive membership date in the New York state and local employees' retirement system for service starting in 2003.
Title
Grants Danielle Galasso a retroactive membership date in the New York state and local employees' retirement system for service starting in 2003.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6320A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2043 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5743A |
2018-05-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06320 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - tabled