NY S05735 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.349
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.349
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Clayton, county of Jefferson to transfer and convey certain parklands to Dean Hyde in exchange for certain lands owned by Dean Hyde which shall be used as parkland and as part of the village of Clayton's riverwalk project.
Title
Authorizes the village of Clayton, county of Jefferson to transfer and convey certain parklands to Dean Hyde in exchange for certain lands owned by Dean Hyde which shall be used as parkland and as part of the village of Clayton's riverwalk project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.349 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.581 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7909b |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1507 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5735B |
2015-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5735A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07909 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5735b