NY S05734 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a multi-agency study of the issues impacting the continuum of caregiving in the state; requires the submission of a report of the findings, conclusions and recommendations from such study to the governor and the legislature.
Title
Requires a multi-agency study of the issues impacting the continuum of caregiving in the state; requires the submission of a report of the findings, conclusions and recommendations from such study to the governor and the legislature.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.75 |
2022-11-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.123 |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | substituted for a6202a |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.557 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5734A |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.833 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A06202 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - substituted by s5734a