NY S05733 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the city school district of the city of Salamanca to establish a reserve fund for federal impact aid in the event such aid is reduced.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the city school district of the city of Salamanca to establish a reserve fund for federal impact aid in the event such aid is reduced.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-28Assemblyreferred to education
2024-05-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1280
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-30Assemblyreferred to education
2023-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1105
2023-05-22SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-03-15SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A02662 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback