NY S05727 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the filing and determination of a petition for the posting of security by persons against whom criminal charges are pending as the result of a crime against the animal.
Title
Provides for the filing and determination of a petition for the posting of security by persons against whom criminal charges are pending as the result of a crime against the animal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5727A |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.756 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A07969 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - print number 7969a