NY S05724 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the "Fallen Skywalkers Memorial Bridge" in the city of Buffalo in Erie county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Fallen Skywalkers Memorial Bridge" in the city of Buffalo in Erie county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04Assemblyreferred to transportation
2024-04-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-04-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.118
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-30Assemblyreferred to transportation
2023-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1172
2023-03-15SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A07683 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback