NY S05712 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.511
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.511
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to consumer directed personal assistance programs.
Title
Relates to consumer directed personal assistance programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.511 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.566 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7532a |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1639 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5712A |
2015-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2015-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07532 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5712a