NY S05705 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the Catskill region off-track betting corporation to include the five counties comprising the city of New York.
Title
Extends the Catskill region off-track betting corporation to include the five counties comprising the city of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] |
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Malcolm Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1666 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5705B |
2014-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2014-06-11 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 5705 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5705A |
2014-06-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2013-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A04236 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - ordered to third reading rules cal.595