NY S05703 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to speed limits in the village of Flower Hill, town of North Hempstead, county of Nassau; provides that such speed limits may be established at not less than twenty-five miles per hour on village roads in the village of Flower Hill.
Title
Relates to speed limits in the village of Flower Hill, town of North Hempstead, county of Nassau; provides that such speed limits may be established at not less than twenty-five miles per hour on village roads in the village of Flower Hill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.850 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07538 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation