NY S05696 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the public service commission to review broadband and fiber optic services within the state and requires the expansion of broadband and fiber optic services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the public service commission to review broadband and fiber optic services within the state and requires the expansion of broadband and fiber optic services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1566
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-13SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06679 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - print number 6679a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback